skip to content

Huang, Shirley Chien-Chieh

CPSO#: 100104

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Geriatric Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 14195
Fax: (613) 761-5334 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winchester District Memorial
Hospital, 566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 14195
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shirley C.C. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Huang ( CPSO# 100104)

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Geriatric Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIRLEY CHIEN-CHIEH HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 03 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014