skip to content

Huang, Alexander Francis

CPSO#: 95751

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3 E N - 435
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3242 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Huang ( CPSO# 95751 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
3 Eaton North, Suite 435
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER FRANCIS HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016