skip to content

Hua, Johnson Tzai-Sun

CPSO#: 22192

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI Clinic
Royal Bank Plaza
200 Bay StreetM5J 2J3
Toronto Ont
Toronto ON  M5V 2A9
Phone: 416-368-6787
Fax: 416-368-7632 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakefront clinic
550 Queens Quay west
Toronto ON  M5V 3M8
Canada
Phone: 6473470576
Fax: 6473479348
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: 501W-500 Queens Quay West Toronto ON M5V 3K8
Date Received: 08 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019