skip to content

Hsuen, John Shan Chung

CPSO#: 27746

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Japanese

Education: University of Madras, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hsuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2022

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 6, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Shan Chung Hsuen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 18, 2021:

(a) I, Dr. Hsuen, consent to this Undertaking being posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Hsuen, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (11)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Effective March 1, 2022, Dr. Hsuen has voluntarily resigned from the College and has ceased to practice medicine in all jurisdictions. He has also agreed not to apply or reapply for registration to practice medicine in any jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)