skip to content

Hradecky, Cyril Michael

CPSO#: 26329

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their records may contact: Queensway Carleton Hospital, 3045 Baseline Road, Ottawa, ON, K2H 8N7 or Tel: 613-721-4700.
Date Received: 26 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Cyril Michael Hradecky to the College of Physicians and Surgeons effective April 30, 2017:

Dr. Hradecky may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Hradecky shall limit his practice to Queensway Carleton Hospital (Ottawa) unless he obtains the consent of the College to practise elsewhere.