skip to content

Howe, Brett Lawrence

CPSO#: 92898

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2462 Howard Ave
Suite 126
Windsor Professional Centre
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: 226-674-4120
Fax: 226-674-4121 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brett Howe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Howe ( CPSO# 92898 )

Business Address:
126 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (226) 674-4120

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRETT LAWRENCE HOWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2016