skip to content

Howarth, Briana Siobhan

CPSO#: 97575

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:07 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIANA SIOBHAN HOWARTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2020