skip to content

Howard, John Mitchell

CPSO#: 30476

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 30 Nov 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Nov 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John M. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Electronic Medical Records Middlesex Centre Family Medical Clinic 36 Heritage Drive Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
Date Received: 10 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Nov 2017