skip to content

Howard, Jessica Catherine

CPSO#: 86532

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Middlesex Centre Regional Medical
Box 160
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone: (519) 666-1610
Fax: (519) 666-0281 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

South Huron Hospital
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S1
Canada
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Fax: (519) 235-3405
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Charlotte Eleanor Englehart
Hospital of Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Canada
Phone: (519) 882-4325 Ext. 2404
Fax: (519) 882-3711
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

LHSC - Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A5W9
Canada
Phone: 5196858500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Malik Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Howard ( CPSO# 86532 )
Dr. S. Malik ( CPSO# 86890 )

Business Address:
36 Heritage Drive
Box 160
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone Number: (519) 666-1610

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
450 Blanches Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S1
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA CATHERINE HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009