Hou Liu, Zhe Nana (CPSO#: 99451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trent Hills Family Health Team
119 Isabella Street
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone: 705 653 1801
Fax: 705 653-5483
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZHE NANA HOU LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOU LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2014