skip to content

Hossenbux, Farook

CPSO#: 25257

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Oct 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Oct 2000
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: 613 592 1448
Fax: 613 591 3778 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:27 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Oct 2000

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 02 Oct 2000 Active
             Effective October 2, 2000, Dr. Farook Hossenbux undertakes that he will not
            perform or interpret echocardiograms.