skip to content

Hoselton, Stacey Lynn

CPSO#: 94146

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact the clinic and/or hospital where they were seen by Dr. Hoselton: Quinte Health Care, Department of Family Medicine, 265 Dundas Street East, Belleville, ON, K8N 5A9, Tel: 613-969-7400
Date Received: 31 May 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Aug 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019