skip to content

Hosein, Maryam

CPSO#: 95296

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4169786976 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARYAM HOSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2021