skip to content

Horsey, Mary Elizabeth

CPSO#: 32169

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 1963

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 2-Jul-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Record Storage & Retreival Service 111 St. Regis Crescent Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Instructions: call RSRS at 1.888.563.3732, or call the office number at 705.726.5453 for the next 6 months (end of Feb 2013)
Date Received: 29 Aug 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2014