skip to content

Horri, Mehdi

CPSO#: 87715

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 May 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 May 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 - 1176 Nicholson Rd
Estevan SK  S4A 0H3
Phone: (306) 637-2770

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEHDI HORRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2007 to 17 Dec 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2007 to 24 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2008 to 24 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 26 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 20 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2020

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Horri’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that the governing body of a health profession in another jurisdiction found Dr. Horri to have committed professional misconduct which would also be professional misconduct in Ontario.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Sep 2016
Summary:

On September 26, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Mehdi Horri committed an act of professional misconduct in that he 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional, by having engaged in a sexual relationship with a patient too 
soon after the termination of the doctor-patient relationship.   
 
Dr. Horri, a 51-year-old family physician who practises family medicine in Saskatchewan, 
graduated in 1998 from the University of Tehran in Iran. He obtained a certificate of Independent 
Practice in 2015.  
 
Patient A was in her early 20’s when she became a patient of a family doctor, Dr. X, who 
diagnosed her with depression with suicidal ideation. Dr. X prescribed antidepressants to Patient 
A. During her third and final visit, Dr. X diagnosed Patient A with insomnia second to 
depression and found that Patient A did not presently have suicidal or homicidal thought process, 
prescribing her a different anti-depressant and sleep medicine. Following this appointment, Dr. X 
began a maternity leave.  
 
Patient A agreed to continue to attend for appointments with Dr. Horri, who was acting as a 
substitute during Dr. X’s leave.  
 
DOCTOR-PATIENT RELATIONSHIP 
 
Dr. Horri saw Patient A between January and June 2010, continuing the care plan commenced by 
Dr. X and providing Patient A with on-going support and medication management.  
 
Patient A describes that, because Dr. Horri was a medical professional whom she would not have 
to see again, she disclosed personal information to Dr. Horri that she had not previously 
disclosed to anyone. Dr. Horri provided Patient A with support for ongoing personal challenges, 
depression, anxiety, and sleep difficulties. Dr. Horri renewed prescriptions to Patient A for anti-
depressants and sleep medicine. 
 
During their appointments, Patient A recollects that when she would share with Dr. Horri details 
of her familial challenges, Dr. Horri would tell her that he could relate to what she was 
experiencing given his own experiences with his family of origin. 
 
POST-TERMINATION SEXUAL RELATIONSHIP 
 
Patient A’s final appointment with Dr. Horri was on a date in mid-June 2010, which was the date 
the doctor-patient relationship ended. Following that appointment, Patient A dropped off a thank 
you note for Dr. Horri at his office. Dr. Horri looked up Patient A’s phone number in her 
medical. He called her to thank her for the card, to offer his ongoing friendship, and to suggest 
that Patient A call him if she needed a friend. 
 
Patient A described that at his point in her life, she was fairly isolated from her support network.   
 
Dr. Horri and Patient A developed a friendship over the subsequent weeks. They met on a few 
occasions for coffee or walks together.   
 
Approximately two weeks after Patient A’s last appointment with Dr. Horri, Dr. Horri visited 
Patient A’s apartment. After watching a movie together, they had sexual intercourse. Patient A 
described that she was scared and upset because they did not use a condom and she was worried 
about pregnancy. Dr. Horri left $200 on Patient A’s nightstand, which Patient A found highly 
insulting. Dr. Horri intended this as a supportive gesture. 
 
On July 1, 2010, Dr. Horri left for Thunder Bay where he entered the Family Practice 
anaesthesia program at the Northern Ontario Medical School.  
 
After his departure, Dr. Horri and Patient A continued an on-and-off long-distance intimate 
relationship for about three years. Patient A travelled to see Dr. Horri and Dr. Horri would 
sometimes travel to see Patient A. During and after the end of the sexual relationship, Dr. Horri 
provided Patient A with gifts, including two $2,000 e-transfers, a credit card in her name, and a 
laptop. Dr. Horri and Patient A remained in contact after the sexual relationship ended until the 
spring of 2014.  
 
DISPOSITION 
 
On October 13, 2016, the Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. On March 24, 
2017, the Discipline Committee released its decision on penalty. 
 
APPEAL 
 
On April 6, 2017, Dr. Horri appealed the penalty decision to the Superior Court of Justice 
(Divisional Court). Pursuant to s. 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the appeal 
operated to stay the penalty decision pending the outcome of the appeal. On May 30, 2018, the 
Divisional Court allowed Dr. Horri’s appeal and returned the matter of penalty to the Discipline 
Committee for redetermination. On June 19, 2018, the College filed a motion for leave to appeal 
the decision of the Divisional Court to the Court of Appeal. On September 17, 2018, the Court of 
Appeal denied the motion for leave to appeal. 
 
PENALTY RE-DETERMINATION 
 
The penalty redetermination hearing took place on November 7, 2018. The Discipline 
Committee reserved its decision. On March 29, 2019, the Discipline Committee ordered and 
directed that: 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Horri’s certificate of registration for a period of twelve months, 
   effective immediately; 
-  The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Horri’s 
   certificate of registration: 
      o  Dr. Horri shall complete an individualized course in medical ethics approved by the 
         College to include professional responsibility, boundaries, and professional 
         communication within 12 months of the date of this Order and will provide reports of 
         successful completion to the College, at his own expense. 
-  Dr. Horri appear before the panel to be reprimanded; 
-  Dr. Horri pay to the College costs in the amount of $15,680.00 within 30 days of the date of 
   this Order.  
 
APPEAL 
 
On April 26, 2019, Dr. Horri appealed the penalty decision to the Superior Court of Justice 
(Divisional Court). Pursuant to s. 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the appeal 
operates to stay the penalty decision pending the outcome of the appeal.  
 
On June 18, 2019, the Court received Dr. Horri’s Notice of Abandonment of his appeal. 
Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing: September 26, 2016 Penalty Hearing : October 13, 2016 New Penalty Hearing date: November 7, 2018

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: April 4, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On March 23, 2020, the Council of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Saskatchewan ordered that Dr. Horri’s medical licence be suspended for a period of 4 months commencing on April 4, 2020 and that Dr. Horri be reprimanded. CPSO was notified of this action by CPSS on March 23, 2020.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: September 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Non-Ontario Disciplinary Finding:

Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On June 16, 2017, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Saskatchewan revoked Dr. Horri’s medical licence based on the finding of unprofessional conduct made by the CPSO against Dr. Horri in 2016 (See Previous Hearings for more information). We note that the Saskatchewan College reinstated Dr. Horri’s licence on June 22, 2018.

 

Source: College of Physicians & Surgeons of Saskatchewan
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: June 16, 2017
Summary: Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information: On June 16, 2017, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Saskatchewan revoked Dr. Horri’s medical licence based on the finding of unprofessional conduct made by the CPSO against Dr. Horri in 2016 (See Previous Hearings for more information). We note that the Saskatchewan College reinstated Dr. Horri’s licence on June 22, 2018.