Horozov, Nikolay Petrov (CPSO#: 100595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jun 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, Russian

Education:Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
VA Tennessee Valley Healthcare Syst
Alvin York Campus
3400 Lebanon Pike
Murfreesboro TN  37129
United States
Phone: 615-225-6708
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Horozov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 25 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Alaska
USA - Hawaii
USA - Kentucky
USA - Tennessee

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Jun 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Nikolay  Petrov  Horozov  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  psychiatry.