skip to content

Horowitz, Daniel

CPSO#: 97537

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:All Saints University of Medicine, Aruba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Jan 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 28 May 2012 to 22 Jun 2012
EL - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015 Active
             Dr. Daniel Horowitz may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.