Horner, Robert Joseph (CPSO#: 90068)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Horner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 24 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 2011