skip to content

Horne, Pamela Ellen

CPSO#: 97086

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Nov 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Colorado

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective:13 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAMELA ELLEN HORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2019