skip to content

Hopson, William Leo Gilbert

CPSO#: 22057

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1997