skip to content

Hopp, Marilyn Henderson

CPSO#: 26337

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Feb 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2000