skip to content

Hopkins, Donald Ross

CPSO#: 19825

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 1997

Summary

Date of Death: 7-Nov-2001

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1997