skip to content

Hophing, Lauren Jane

CPSO#: 115231

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital 30 Bond St.
3 Shuter, Office 3-040 (3rd floor)
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-684-6060 Ext. x2083 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAUREN JANE HOPHING shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HOPHING is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. HOPHING shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HOPHING is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HOPHING shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HOPHING is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HOPHING no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022