skip to content

Hope, Lily Anna

CPSO#: 23724

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 132 Parkdale South Hamilton ON L8K 3P3 Tele: 905 544 6599
Date Received: 03 Jan 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2020