skip to content

Hoosainny, Waseema Nisaa

CPSO#: 98389

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
627 Lyons Lane
Oakville ON  L6J 5Z7
Phone: (905) 844-7238 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Waseema Hoosainny Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hoosainny ( CPSO# 98389 )

Business Address:
B1-627 Lyons Lane
Oakville ON  L6J 5Z7

Business Address:
G14
1455 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 2J1

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WASEEMA NISAA HOOSAINNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOSAINNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 05 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018