skip to content

Hooper, Catherine Marie Freeman

CPSO#: 94520

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Catherine Marie Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hooper ( CPSO# 94520 )

Business Address:
200 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 844-3281

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIE FREEMAN HOOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012