skip to content

Hood, Nancy Anne

CPSO#: 33172

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Feb 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carmichael Hood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 245 Eglington Ave E Toronto ON M4P 3B7
Date Received: 27 Feb 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Dec 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Feb 2019