Hood, Eric (CPSO#: 19489)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Mar 2019

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1507 - 61 St. Clair Avenue W. Toronto, ON M4V 2Y8
Date Received: 21 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2019