skip to content

Hontscharuk, Rayisa Stephanie

CPSO#: 98713

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAYISA STEPHANIE HONTSCHARUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONTSCHARUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2019