skip to content

Hong, Kim Edward

CPSO#: 21503

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Feb 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004