Hommel, Joel Patrick (CPSO#: 100716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Synergy Centre
1635 Hyde Park Rd
London ON  N6H 5L7
Phone: (519) 266-3600
Fax: (888) 758-3601
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hommel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hommel ( CPSO# 100716)

Business Address:
Synergy Centre
1635 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 266-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL PATRICK HOMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOMMEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015