skip to content

Homat, Arman

CPSO#: 96788

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 8H9
Phone: (647) 677-7933
Fax: (647) 933-0199 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Arman Homat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Homat ( CPSO# 96788 )

Business Address:
207-7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 8H9
Phone Number: (647) 677-7933

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Sep 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2013 Active
             Dr. Arman Homat may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine, only.