skip to content

Holton, Gordon Raymond

CPSO#: 92657

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Apr 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington ON  K0K 3L0
Phone: 6133991281
Fax: 6133992464 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kristin R. Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013
Corporation Name: Gordon R. Holton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Holton ( CPSO# 92657 )

Business Address:
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington ON  K0K 3L0
Phone Number: (613) 399-1281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GORDON RAYMOND HOLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2010