skip to content

Holtby, Richard Mark

CPSO#: 31751

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard M. Holtby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.