skip to content

Holt, David J

CPSO#: 90307

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Center
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David J. Holt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pun ( CPSO# 87998 )
Dr. D. Holt ( CPSO# 90307 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 489-2106

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID J HOLT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 06 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
EL - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2012