skip to content

Holowaty, Melissa Nicolle

CPSO#: 89122

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Ottawa Street East
Havelock ON  K0L 1Z0
Phone: 1 833 558 0801
Fax: 833 558 5635 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Holowaty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Holowaty ( CPSO# 89122 )

Business Address:
1 Madoc Street
P O Box 520
Marmora ON  K0K 2M0
Phone Number: (613) 472-2552

Business Address:
70 Murphy Street
Trenton ON  K8V 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 965-0698

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA NICOLLE HOLOWATY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLOWATY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 04 Jan 2010 to 03 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011