skip to content

Holowaty, Eric Joseph

CPSO#: 29031

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 1986

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective:02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011