skip to content

Holmes, Rebecca Ann

CPSO#: 93072

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 105
145 Station Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: (613) 771-1833 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Holmes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Holmes ( CPSO# 93072 )

Business Address:
389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0

Business Address:
145 Station St
Unit 105
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 May 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANN HOLMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013