skip to content

Hollowell, Jill Suzanne

CPSO#: 87872

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nova Southeastern University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3N2
Phone: (519) 653-3321
Fax: (519) 653-3498 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jill Hollowell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hollowell ( CPSO# 87872 )

Business Address:
Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3N2
Phone Number: (519) 653-3321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JILL SUZANNE HOLLOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOWELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013