skip to content

Hollingworth, James Leslie

CPSO#: 28598

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jim Hollingworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage & Retreival Services 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel : 416-398-0638
Date Received: 22 Apr 2015


Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. Website: www.GetMyMedRecord.ca Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1
Instructions: Please submit an online request through the website or contact RSRS Support at the phone number provided.
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015