skip to content

Holland, Craig William

CPSO#: 100171

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Nelson Medical Professional Group, 301 Victoria Avenue, Fort Frances, ON P9A 2C1
Date Received: 19 May 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan
USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016