skip to content

Holder, Douglas Allan

CPSO#: 27300

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Douglas A. Holder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Inc., 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:28 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016