skip to content

Hojilla, Carlo Vincent

CPSO#: 93979

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Pathology and Lab Med
600 University Ave, Suite 6-400
Toronto ON  M6G1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4462
Fax: (416) 586-8628 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Services
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P7P3
Canada
Phone: 9054727373 Ext. 6571
Fax: 9054727133
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carlo Hojilla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARLO VINCENT HOJILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOJILLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015