Hogg, Ryan Craig (CPSO#: 98511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: Hogg, Ryan (used until: 23 Nov 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Medical Group FHT
4421 Queen Street
Queen Street Medical Building
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone: 905-356-2236
Fax: 905-356-2568
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R C Hogg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hogg ( CPSO# 98511 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Niagara Medical Group FHT
Queen Street Medical Building
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone Number: (905) 356-2236

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN CRAIG HOGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2014