skip to content

Hogg, Donald William

CPSO#: 22846

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Hunt Club Medical Centre Suite 104 3328 McCarthy Road Ottawa, Ontario K1V 0H9 Tel: (613) 526-5515
Date Received: 16 Feb 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2011

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking, effective August 15, 2011, by Dr. Donald William Hogg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Hogg:
B1. (1) Hereby resign from the College on or before December 31, 2011.
(2) Undertake not to apply or re apply for registration as a physician in any other jurisdiction after my resignation.
(3) Agree that the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding
on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, the right to
re commence the Investigation it terminated as a result of this undertaking.
II (1) Agree that effectively immediately I will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions of any Narcotic Drugs or Preparations, Controlled Drugs, or Benzodiazepines /Other Targeted Substances.
III. (1) Agree to practice under a clinical supervisor.
IV (1) Agree that I shall post a sign in my waiting room, as follows: "Dr. Hogg has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and/or Other Targeted Substances.
C.(3) Consent to this undertaking being entered on the public register.