skip to content

Hogan, Angela Bridget

CPSO#: 85826

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Departement d' Anesthesiologie
713 chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:08 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGELA BRIDGET HOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2011