skip to content

Hoffman, Andrea Shoshana

CPSO#: 86780

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Kilgour Rd
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Ext. 6343
Fax: (416) 494-6621 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA SHOSHANA HOFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2013