skip to content

Hofer, Stefan Oliver Paul

CPSO#: 87771

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Oct 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German

Education:University of Amsterdam, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
Suite 8N865
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3449
Fax: (416) 340-4403 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dryden Regional Health Centre
Division of Plastic Surgery
PO Box 3003
56 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Canada
Phone: (807) 223-8200
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stefan Hofer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hofer ( CPSO# 87771 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
8N-865
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3449

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4502

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:16 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014 Active
 Dr.  Stefan  Oliver  Paul  Hofer may practise medicine independently in plastic
            surgery, only.