skip to content

Hofer, Michael

CPSO#: 86657

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Stover Street North
PO Box 147
Norwich ON  N0J 1P0
Phone: 226-325-0108
Fax: 226-325-2268 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Hofer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hofer ( CPSO# 86657 )

Business Address:
11 Stover Street North
PO Box 147
Norwich ON  N0J 1P0
Phone Number: (226) 325-0108

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2012 Active
 Dr. Michael Hofer may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine, in an
            office setting only.