skip to content

Hodsman, Anthony Bryan

CPSO#: 30324

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. B. Hodsman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Records St Josephs Health Center 268 Grosvenor Street London, ON N6A 4V2 Tel: 519 646 6100 x65585 Fax: 519 646 6028
Date Received: 07 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014